RI H5396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of veteran plates with decals affixed to the top left corner for veterans who are recipients of the Congressional Medal of Honor, Distinguished Flying Cross, Silver Star and Bronze medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2019)
2019-02-15HouseCommittee transferred to House Special Legislation
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback