RI H5395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes for the purposes of RI state income taxes, the first $25,000 of military retirement income, paid by the state or federal government to persons 60 years or older.
Title
Personal Income Tax - Military Retirement
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5395.pdf |