RI H5389 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits more than two (2) members of the state police to be from the same family whether by blood, adoption or marriage.
Title
State Police
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5389.pdf |