RI H5381 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the composition of the Fort Adams foundation to include a representative from the division of parks and recreation in place of a member of the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fort Adams Foundation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18HouseSigned by Governor
2023-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-05-16SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-05-12SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/16/2023)
2023-04-18HouseHouse read and passed
2023-04-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/18/2023)
2023-04-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for consideration (04/05/2023)
2023-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023)
2023-03-14HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-13HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/15/2023)
2023-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback