RI H5381 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the term Oriental medicine in defining the scope and technique of acupuncture.
Title
The Healing Art Of Acupuncture
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2015) |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-05-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2015) |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2015) |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |