RI H5379 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Harrisville fire district charter to allow the district to provide rescue services in addition to fire suppression, medical and ambulance services.
Title
Relating To Harrisville Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-05-02 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/19/2023) |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |