RI H5378 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of North Kingstown, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of North Kingstown on November 8, 2022.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of North Kingstown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-28 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |