RI H5376 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the intentional simultaneous release of ten (10) or more balloons inflated with lighter-than-air gas.
Title
Balloons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2021-05-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-04-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |