RI H5375 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/28/2023)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/28/2023)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that compact growth in municipalities cannot be mandatory and would require that an analysis be conducted by the secretary of housing addressing all issues relative to the housing crisis prior to any housing project promoting compact growth.
Title
Rhode Island Comprehensive Planning And Land Use Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/07/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5375.pdf |