RI H5375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases mandatory insurance coverage for hearing aids from $1,500 to $2,000, per ear, every three (3) years. In addition, the amount of insurance coverage would no longer be based on the age of the recipient.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5375.pdf |