RI H5373 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends IOD benefits to police officers/firefighters suffering from post-traumatic stress injuries/provides municipal police/firefighters retiring due to PTSI accidental disability retirement allowance.
Title
Relief Of Injured And Deceased Firefighters And Police Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/16/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5373.pdf |