RI H5373 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires 25% of price of cemetery lot be deposited in perpetual care fund (PCF). PCF to file annual report with AG.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cemeteries--cemetery Perpetual Funds Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021)
2021-02-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback