RI H5370 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurers to accommodate the request for communication in the form and format requested by the insured.
Title
Confidentiality Of Health Care Communications And Information Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |