RI H5370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds court magistrates to the list of covered public officials that are protected from felonious threats.
Title
Threats And Extortion
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2015) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2015) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | House read and passed |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/17/2015) |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/10/2015) |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |