RI H5369 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a fee on companies that sell fossil fuels in RI and also establishes a receipt account to disburse the funds from.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energize Rhode Island: Clean Energy Investment And Carbon Pricing Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-05-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017)
2017-04-25HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/27/2017)
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-02-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback