RI H5359 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the family court from detaining/committing any juvenile under the age of 14 years to the training school for any offense other than murder/first degree sexual assault or an attempt to commit such offenses.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5359.pdf |