RI H5354 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Health And Safety Impact Of Revising Commercial Sexual Activity Laws (creates A Twelve (12) Member Commission To Study The Health And Safety Impact Of Revising Commercial Sexual Activity Laws, And Who Would Report Back To The House By February 7, 2020, And Expire On May 7, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Health And Safety Impact Of Revising Commercial Sexual Activity Laws (creates A Twelve (12) Member Commission To Study The Health And Safety Impact Of Revising Commercial Sexual Activity Laws, And Who Would Report Back To The House By February 7, 2020, And Expire On May 7, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/12/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5354.pdf |