RI H5353 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the selection pool for court appointed receivers be composed of at least ten percent (10%) of receivers who are persons of color.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions-selection Pool For Court Appointed Receivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5353.pdf |