RI H5353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limits on the maximum number of patients that may be assigned to a unit’s registered nurses in particular health care situations.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5353.pdf |