RI H5350 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Limits the copayment or coinsurance requirement on specialty drugs to one hundred fifty dollars ($150) for a thirty (30) day supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-13HouseProposed Substitute
2023-06-12HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2023)
2023-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023)
2023-02-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback