RI H5347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the release of certain records pertaining to the investigation of 38 Studios, LLC.
Title
38 Studios, Llc
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee voted to reconsider |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |
2017-03-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |