RI H5342 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public high schools to require students, as part of the curriculum, to enroll in a nutrition course, food preparation course and cooking course during any year of a student's four (4) year enrollment.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5342.pdf |