RI H5340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tolls the statute of limitations during the period of investigation by the commission for human rights for certain violations for up to one year, starting on the date the charge is filed until the date the commission makes a determination.
Title
Fair Employment Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-03-28 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |