RI H5330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Possibility Of Shared 911 Services Amongst Various Governmental Entities (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study The Possibility Of Various Governmental Agencies Sharing 911 Services, And Who Would Report Back To The House By January 6, 2016, And Would Expire On March 6, 2016.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Possibility Of Shared 911 Services Amongst Various Governmental Entities (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study The Possibility Of Various Governmental Agencies Sharing 911 Services, And Who Would Report Back To The House By January 6, 2016, And Would Expire On March 6, 2016.)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015) |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5330.pdf |