RI H5328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires funeral directors/agents to notify secretary of state and the chairperson of the board of canvassers upon filing death certificate for the purpose of removal from the roles of registered voters.
Title
Vital Records
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/12/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |