RI H5324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires charter school populations to reflect the combined demographics of the sending district(s) in terms of special education, English language learners, and students who qualify for free and reduced price lunch.
Title
Establishment Of Charter Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Jose Serodio [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5324.pdf |