RI H5320 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Reaffirming The Friendship Between Rhode Island And Taiwan, Enhancing Bilateral Relations, Celebrating The 40th Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act (tra), And Supporting Taiwan In The International Community

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Reaffirming The Friendship Between Rhode Island And Taiwan, Enhancing Bilateral Relations, Celebrating The 40th Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act (tra), And Supporting Taiwan In The International Community

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHouse read and passed
2019-03-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/13/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019)
2019-02-12HouseMeeting postponed (02/12/2019)
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House Small Business

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback