RI H5319 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to obtain search warrants for electronic information, data, location information and other identifying information of subscribers and customers, except in specified circumstances.
Title
Search Warrants -- Electronic Information And Data Privacy Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5319.pdf |