RI H5319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires municipalities to exempt from taxation the real property of a surviving spouse of a law enforcement officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty, who occupies the real property as their principal place of residence.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5319.pdf |