RI H5318 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits certain volunteer firefighters to purchase motor vehicles by utilizing state purchasing provisions.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |