RI H5318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the benefit to customers in the PUC's study of the distribution charge.
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-05-31 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |