RI H5317 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-28 - Meeting postponed (06/28/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-28 - Meeting postponed (06/28/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - The Return Or Exchange Of Drugs Act (would Repeal "the Utilization Of Unused Prescription Drugs Act" And Would Establish A New Program Known As "the Return Or Exchange Of Drugs Act" Which Would Allow Pharmacies To Accept For Return And Redispensing Certain Prescription Drugs)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - The Return Or Exchange Of Drugs Act (would Repeal "the Utilization Of Unused Prescription Drugs Act" And Would Establish A New Program Known As "the Return Or Exchange Of Drugs Act" Which Would Allow Pharmacies To Accept For Return And Redispensing Certain Prescription Drugs)
Sponsors
Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | House | Meeting postponed (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2013) |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5317.pdf |