RI H5309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the authority of the Rhode Island commerce corporation to finance any transaction to five million dollars ($5,000,000) for any one individual, business entity or project.
Title
Rhode Island Commerce Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5309.pdf |