RI H5309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a process to ensure persons in government custody are counted as their actual residence for purposes of redistricting.
Title
Residence Of Those In Government Custody Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/15/2017) |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5309.pdf |