RI H5305 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that on each primary for election of national convention delegates and elections for presidential preference primaries, that all public elementary and secondary schools be closed.
Title
Elective Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Committee on State Government & Elections: Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Committee on State Government & Elections: Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/25/2023) |
2023-03-07 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/07/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |