RI H5305 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that interest on judgments would accrue from the date of the filing of the civil action and not the date the cause of action accrued. This would also apply to medical malpractice claims.
Title
Procedure Generally -- Judgments, Orders And Decrees -- Interest On Judgments
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5305.pdf |