RI H5302 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Leonela Felix to join Kayla Simone K. Rosen and Michael Zachary Mezera in marriage on or about May 20, 2023, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2023) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |