RI H5302 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019-2020 (requires That All Legislative Grants Allocated To The Senate Be Distributed In Accordance With The Rules Of The Senate And That All Legislative Grants Allocated To The House Of Representatives Be Divided Equally Among The (75) Legislative Districts.)
Title
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019-2020 (requires That All Legislative Grants Allocated To The Senate Be Distributed In Accordance With The Rules Of The Senate And That All Legislative Grants Allocated To The House Of Representatives Be Divided Equally Among The (75) Legislative Districts.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5302.pdf |