RI H5294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Public Transit Authority To Conduct An Elder Mobility Transportation Study As Part Of Updating The State’s Coordinated Human Services Transit Plan
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Public Transit Authority To Conduct An Elder Mobility Transportation Study As Part Of Updating The State’s Coordinated Human Services Transit Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5294.pdf |