RI H5293 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the operation of a home-based business, which meets criteria for home office IRS income tax deduction, without securing approval from the municipality with no storage of chemicals/park heavy equipment/not more than 10% of premises used for parking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Ordinances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2023)
2023-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback