RI H5291 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Meeting postponed (03/28/2023)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Meeting postponed (03/28/2023)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the towns of Burrillville and Glocester to publish notices in any newspaper located within their municipalities and would also allow publication in other designated platforms selected by their city or town councils.
Title
Public Notice Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Meeting postponed (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5291.pdf |