RI H5291 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires secretary of state to collect/publish governor's executive orders on website arranged by topic rather than in numerical/chronological order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Register

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
2019-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2019)
2019-02-15HouseCommittee transferred to House Special Legislation
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback