RI H5291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals The Public Utility Securitization Act (ยงยง39-1-1 to 60), passed in 1997.
Title
Securitization Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |