RI H5288 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes restricted receipts account within commerce corp for fines collected for violations of COVID-19/disaster rules for forgiveable loans/grants to small businesses.
Title
Rhode Island Commerce Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5288.pdf |