RI H5287 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all defined pension plans, excluding certain governmental plans, which are not covered by the ERISA and have at least two hundred (200) members, comply with ERISA's annual reporting provisions.
Title
Non-erisa Covered Pension Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2019-05-22 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-30 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |