RI H5283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all foster parents to undergo sensitivity training regarding the culture of their foster child.
Title
Licensing And Monitoring Of Child Placing Agencies, Child Caring Agencies, Foster And Adoptive Homes, And Children's Behavioral Health Programs
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/10/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |