RI H5282 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires managed care organizations to consult with the EOHHS to develop incentives for nursing facilities that demonstrate lower direct care staff turnover.
Title
Long-term Managed Care Arrangements
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5282.pdf |