RI H5279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Maintenance Of Order On Campus (would Require Campus Police Officers Who Have Successfully Completed The Rhode Island Municipal Police Training Academy Or Its Equivalent, And A Firearms Training Program As Required Under Section 11-47-15.1, To Carry A Firearm)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Maintenance Of Order On Campus (would Require Campus Police Officers Who Have Successfully Completed The Rhode Island Municipal Police Training Academy Or Its Equivalent, And A Firearms Training Program As Required Under Section 11-47-15.1, To Carry A Firearm)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5279.pdf |