RI H5276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 House Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Excludes the growth of marijuana and any of its derivatives from the provisions requiring the permitted use of plant agriculture within all city and town zoning ordinances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Ordinances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019)
2019-03-11HouseMeeting postponed (03/13/2019)
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback