RI H5275 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires businesses with gross annual sales of more than $500,000 to post signs that food they offer for sale may contain genetically modified organisms.
Title
Genetically Modified Organisms
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5275.pdf |